NY S07025 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the level of acceptable light transmittance of automobile window tint and film.
Title
Relates to the level of acceptable light transmittance of automobile window tint and film.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7025B |
2021-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7025A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01654 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - enacting clause stricken