NY S07014 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to self-exclusion provisions; provides for moneys forfeited by self-exclusion to be deposited in certain gaming commission accounts.
Title
Relates to self-exclusion provisions; provides for moneys forfeited by self-exclusion to be deposited in certain gaming commission accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2022-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1363 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1671 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |