NY S07014 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to contracting with public libraries by boards of cooperative educational services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to contracting with public libraries by boards of cooperative educational services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.422
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.494
2012-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10147
2012-06-04Assemblyreferred to education
2012-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.868
2012-04-20SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A10147 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s7014

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback