NY S07013 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9943C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9943C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the provision of municipal advanced life support first responder service or municipal ambulance service.
Title
Relates to the provision of municipal advanced life support first responder service or municipal ambulance service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9943C |
2012-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1438 |
2012-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7013C |
2012-06-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2012-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7013B |
2012-05-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2012-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7013A |
2012-05-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2012-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09943 (Same As) 2012-10-03 - signed chap.464