NY S07000 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-04 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies the responsibility of school districts for certain temporary-resident preschool children with disabilities who are in foster care, are homeless or are in residential care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies the responsibility of school districts for certain temporary-resident preschool children with disabilities who are in foster care, are homeless or are in residential care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-04Assemblyreferred to education
2024-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-04SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1696
2024-06-04SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-20SenatePRINT NUMBER 7000B
2024-05-20SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DISABILITIES
2024-05-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 7000A
2024-05-06SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DISABILITIES
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO DISABILITIES
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-07Assemblyreferred to education
2023-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-01SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1537
2023-06-01SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-16SenateREFERRED TO DISABILITIES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback