NY S07000 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing Wyoming county to make application to the Foreign Trade Zones Board for a grant to establish, operate and maintain a foreign trade zone or zones and foreign trade sub-zone or sub-zones within such county.
Title
Relates to allowing Wyoming county to make application to the Foreign Trade Zones Board for a grant to establish, operate and maintain a foreign trade zone or zones and foreign trade sub-zone or sub-zones within such county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.370 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.483 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8846 |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.284 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08846 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7000