NY S06988 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.129
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.129
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes twenty-five year retirement programs for members of the New York city employees' retirement system employed as fire protection inspectors and associate fire protection inspectors.
Title
Establishes twenty-five year retirement programs for members of the New York city employees' retirement system employed as fire protection inspectors and associate fire protection inspectors.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.129 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.456 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted for a7962a |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1433 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6988B |
2022-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6988A |
2021-05-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07962 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - substituted by s6988b