NY S06988 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.345
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.345
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the expiration of real estate licenses and service of a real estate salesman with a broker.
Title
Relates to the expiration of real estate licenses and service of a real estate salesman with a broker.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.345 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.228 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9996a |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2012-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.791 |
2012-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6988A |
2012-04-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2012-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09996 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6988a