NY S06976 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Modifies the retirement program for Triborough bridge and tunnel members to a twenty-year retirement program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the retirement program for Triborough bridge and tunnel members to a twenty-year retirement program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-29SenateVETOED MEMO.88
2021-12-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2021-06-09Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-09Assemblyhome rule request
2021-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.624
2021-06-09Assemblysubstituted for a7727
2021-06-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2021-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1582
2021-06-07SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-05-20SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07727 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s6976

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback