NY S06974 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to federal income tax terms and their applicability to state tax law; relates to the New York standard deduction of certain resident individuals; authorizes a resident individual to elect to deduct his New York itemized deduction in lieu of his New York standard deduction.
Title
Relates to federal income tax terms and their applicability to state tax law; relates to the New York standard deduction of certain resident individuals; authorizes a resident individual to elect to deduct his New York itemized deduction in lieu of his New York standard deduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-01-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.252 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6974A |
2018-01-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-12-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09061 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - print number 9061a