NY S06966 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for recommendations on the effective use of pesticides to protect livestock and farm property against Asian longhorned ticks.
Title
Provides for recommendations on the effective use of pesticides to protect livestock and farm property against Asian longhorned ticks.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.67 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.446 |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | substituted for a9742 |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2020-01-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.45 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09742 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.67