NY S06966 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the items which may be sold by a licensed farm cidery and the licensees to whom a farm cidery may sell its cider for resale; authorizes the sale of cider and wine at places authorized to conduct games of chance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the items which may be sold by a licensed farm cidery and the licensees to whom a farm cidery may sell its cider for resale; authorizes the sale of cider and wine at places authorized to conduct games of chance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26Assemblyreferred to economic development
2018-03-26SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-26SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-02-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-02-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-02-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.411
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2017-12-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08895 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - referred to economic development

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback