NY S06965 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to increasing the class for certain vehicular crimes and enacting Kane's law; increases the class of vehicular manslaughter in the first and second degrees, vehicular manslaughter in the second degree, and aggravated unlicensed operation in the first degree.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to increasing the class for certain vehicular crimes and enacting Kane's law; increases the class of vehicular manslaughter in the first and second degrees, vehicular manslaughter in the second degree, and aggravated unlicensed operation in the first degree.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05Assemblyreferred to codes
2018-03-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-02-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-02-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-02-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.478
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2017-12-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A09567 (Same As) 2018-01-23 - referred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback