NY S06962 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to proof of eligibility for volunteer firefighter enhanced cancer disability benefits.
Title
Relates to proof of eligibility for volunteer firefighter enhanced cancer disability benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2020-01-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.41 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09065 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - reported referred to ways and means