NY S06960 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - SIGNED CHAP.116
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - SIGNED CHAP.116
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the commissioner of the department of taxation and finance to establish segment special equalization rates for certain school districts in the town of Guilderland; specifically the Rotterdam-Mohonasen School District, Schalmont School District and Voorheesville School District.
Title
Relates to requiring the commissioner of the department of taxation and finance to establish segment special equalization rates for certain school districts in the town of Guilderland; specifically the Rotterdam-Mohonasen School District, Schalmont School District and Voorheesville School District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.116 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.877 |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | substituted for a8803a |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-27 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2018-02-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6960A |
2018-02-12 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-12 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2018-02-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.282 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-11-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08803 (Same As) 2018-05-16 - substituted by s6960a