NY S06958 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the certification of the final state equalization rate, class ratios, and class equalization rates, if required, shall occur no later than thirty days prior to the last date set by law for levy of taxes of any municipal corporation to which such equalization rate, class ratios, and class equalization rates are applicable.
Title
Requires that the certification of the final state equalization rate, class ratios, and class equalization rates, if required, shall occur no later than thirty days prior to the last date set by law for levy of taxes of any municipal corporation to which such equalization rate, class ratios, and class equalization rates are applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8806 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.280 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-11-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08806 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.132