NY S06952 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to lactation counseling services when such services are ordered by a physician, physician assistant, nurse practitioner, or midwife.
Title
Relates to lactation counseling services when such services are ordered by a physician, physician assistant, nurse practitioner, or midwife.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.61 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.413 |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | substituted for a9648 |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | referred to health |
2020-01-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.31 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09648 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.61