NY S06952 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all motor carriers to post on their internet websites a link to such motor carrier's federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration safety measure systems profile.
Title
Requires all motor carriers to post on their internet websites a link to such motor carrier's federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration safety measure systems profile.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] |
Sen. Jose Peralta [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6952A |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.213 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-11-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08831 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation