NY S06949 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Qualifies the amount of rental surcharge persons or families shall pay in company projects.
Title
Qualifies the amount of rental surcharge persons or families shall pay in company projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2020-01-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.28 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08985 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - reported referred to ways and means