NY S06949 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that real property owned by private water-works corporations shall be wholly or partially exempt from taxation.
Title
Provides that real property owned by private water-works corporations shall be wholly or partially exempt from taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.279 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-11-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08790 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in real property taxation