NY S06943 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - SIGNED CHAP.205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends certain powers of the New York state housing finance agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends certain powers of the New York state housing finance agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-19SenateSIGNED CHAP.205
2023-07-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-09Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-06Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.605
2023-06-06Assemblysubstituted for a7209
2023-06-05Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-30SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1406
2023-05-30SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-22SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-05-16SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A07209 (Same As) 2023-06-06 - substituted by s6943

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback