NY S06942 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for bidding protest procedures for state agencies and public authorities.
Title
Provides for bidding protest procedures for state agencies and public authorities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Procurement And Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Procurement And Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2024-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1394 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1405 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
Same As/Similar To
A07405 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental operations