NY S06942 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Stride, Inc. to file an application for retroactive real property tax exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Stride, Inc. to file an application for retroactive real property tax exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.382
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10928
2018-03-21Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2018-03-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-01-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-01-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-01-29SenateAMENDED 6942A
2018-01-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.278
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-11-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10928 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6942a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback