NY S06933 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the term of office of an election commissioner from two to four years beginning January first of each odd numbered year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the term of office of an election commissioner from two to four years beginning January first of each odd numbered year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-13Assemblyreferred to election law
2024-05-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-03-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-03-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-03-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.630
2024-01-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 6933A
2024-01-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-08Assemblyreferred to election law
2023-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1345
2023-05-15SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A04777 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to election law

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback