NY S06927 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8686A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8686A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a commission to be known as the "New York seawall study commission" which will study the feasibility, costs, impacts, and best locations for construction of a seawall or sea gate being created to protect the city of New York from sea level rise and storm surge along the entire coastline.
Title
Establishes a commission to be known as the "New York seawall study commission" which will study the feasibility, costs, impacts, and best locations for construction of a seawall or sea gate being created to protect the city of New York from sea level rise and storm surge along the entire coastline.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8686A |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1945 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6927A |
2018-06-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2017-10-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08686 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - tabled