NY S06923 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - PRINT NUMBER 6923A
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - PRINT NUMBER 6923A
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring a consumer credit reporting agency to offer identity theft prevention and mitigation services in the case of a breach of the security of such agency's system.
Title
Relates to requiring a consumer credit reporting agency to offer identity theft prevention and mitigation services in the case of a breach of the security of such agency's system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6923A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-10-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08695 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - REFERRED TO RULES