NY S06921 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.420
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the power authority of the state of New York to produce a report detailing best practices with regard to energy cost savings for schools in New York state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the power authority of the state of New York to produce a report detailing best practices with regard to energy cost savings for schools in New York state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.420
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.186
2012-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a8527c
2012-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2012-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1364
2012-06-19SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2012-06-12SenatePRINT NUMBER 6921C
2012-06-12SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2012-06-05SenatePRINT NUMBER 6921B
2012-06-05SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2012-05-22SenatePRINT NUMBER 6921A
2012-05-22SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2012-04-11SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A08527 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s6921c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06921&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06921&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06921
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06921&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06921A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06921&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06921B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06921&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06921C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06921&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/S6921#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback