NY S06918 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the fees imposed by the Lake George park commission for docks, wharfs, moorings and boats.
Title
Increases the fees imposed by the Lake George park commission for docks, wharfs, moorings and boats.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.272 |
2016-08-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.499 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a9494 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.632 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09494 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6918