NY S06898 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.472
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.472
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sick leave for officers and employees with a qualifying World Trade Center condition.
Title
Relates to sick leave for officers and employees with a qualifying World Trade Center condition.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.472 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a10498 |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-01 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2018-04-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6898C |
2018-04-16 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-16 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2018-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.397 |
2018-01-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6898B |
2018-01-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6898A |
2018-01-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-10-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10399 (Same As) 2018-04-27 - enacting clause stricken
A10498 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6898c
A10498 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6898c