NY S06897 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides language translation services to accommodate census self-reporting.
Title
Provides language translation services to accommodate census self-reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-02-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | AMENDED 6897A |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.255 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-12-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09928 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken