NY S06896 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disclosure of the identities of political committees, persons, organizations or agents making certain expenditures for political communications; broadens the definition of "political communications".
Title
Relates to disclosure of the identities of political committees, persons, organizations or agents making certain expenditures for political communications; broadens the definition of "political communications".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-10-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6896A |
2017-10-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-10-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08816 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to election law