NY S06895 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8723A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8723A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Chazy lake as an inland waterway for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates Chazy lake as an inland waterway for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8723A |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.797 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6895A |
2018-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-09-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08723 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.234