NY S06886 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.300
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.300
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that there is no exemption from the requirement of nondiscrimination in advertisements and inquiries for the rental of an apartment in an owner-occupied two-unit dwelling, or for the rental of rooms in an owner-occupied dwelling, and that engaging in discriminatory advertising or inquiries will cause the property to no longer be exempt from full coverage by the nondiscrimination provisions of the human rights law.
Title
Provides that there is no exemption from the requirement of nondiscrimination in advertisements and inquiries for the rental of an apartment in an owner-occupied two-unit dwelling, or for the rental of rooms in an owner-occupied dwelling, and that engaging in discriminatory advertising or inquiries will cause the property to no longer be exempt from full coverage by the nondiscrimination provisions of the human rights law.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.300 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.239 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a7386 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1409 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07386 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6886