NY S06886 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.480
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.480
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting consumer credit reporting agencies from charging a fee for the placement, removal, or temporary lift of a security freeze following consumer credit reporting agency data breaches.
Title
Relates to prohibiting consumer credit reporting agencies from charging a fee for the placement, removal, or temporary lift of a security freeze following consumer credit reporting agency data breaches.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Christopher Jacobs [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.480 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.917 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | substituted for a8672b |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1432 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6886D |
2018-05-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6886C |
2018-05-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6886B |
2018-05-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-10-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6886A |
2017-10-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-09-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08672 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - substituted by s6886d