NY S06884 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - referred to libraries and education technology
Pending: Assembly Libraries and Education Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - referred to libraries and education technology
Pending: Assembly Libraries and Education Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows all libraries of public institutions of higher learning, the state library, and Indian libraries to be open to the public for providing census-related services including the use of computers, secure internet access, census information services and translation services.
Title
Allows all libraries of public institutions of higher learning, the state library, and Indian libraries to be open to the public for providing census-related services including the use of computers, secure internet access, census information services and translation services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
2020-02-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.304 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-12-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |