NY S06882 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.335
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that policies and contracts covering diagnostic screening for prostate cancer shall not be subject to cost sharing; requires notice of availability of such coverage without cost sharing to be provided in the notice to persons at risk of or having prostate cancer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that policies and contracts covering diagnostic screening for prostate cancer shall not be subject to cost sharing; requires notice of availability of such coverage without cost sharing to be provided in the notice to persons at risk of or having prostate cancer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05AssemblySIGNED CHAP.335
2018-10-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading cal.799
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a8683a
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to insurance
2018-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-01-30SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 6882A
2018-01-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-01-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-01-17Senate1ST REPORT CAL.201
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2017-09-22SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08683 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s6882a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback