NY S06860 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Lucky Guys of Long Island Inc. to file an application for retroactive tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes Lucky Guys of Long Island Inc. to file an application for retroactive tax exempt status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.191 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.817 |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a9352a |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2016-04-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-04-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.401 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6860A |
2016-03-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09352 (Same As) 2016-06-02 - substituted by s6860a