NY S06858 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires publication of laws relating to the control of invasive species.
Title
Requires publication of laws relating to the control of invasive species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.342 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.599 |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | substituted for a9581 |
2012-05-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.601 |
2012-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09581 (Same As) 2012-05-21 - substituted by s6858