NY S06857 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the New York state and local employees' retirement system to accept an application for disability retirement benefits from Andrew Reilly, Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the New York state and local employees' retirement system to accept an application for disability retirement benefits from Andrew Reilly, Jr.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-07SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-02-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 6857A
2024-02-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2023-05-11SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07278 (Same As) 2024-05-15 - print number 7278a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback