NY S06841 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides beach access routes for mobility impaired persons on all public state and local beaches up to the median high tide level at tidal beaches; mean high water level at river beaches; or normal recreation water level at lake, pond, and reservoir beaches.
Title
Provides beach access routes for mobility impaired persons on all public state and local beaches up to the median high tide level at tidal beaches; mean high water level at river beaches; or normal recreation water level at lake, pond, and reservoir beaches.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2017-07-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08655 (Same As) 2018-07-09 - enacting clause stricken