NY S06837 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits participation in games of bingo by minors who are accompanied by an adult.
Title
Permits participation in games of bingo by minors who are accompanied by an adult.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2018-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.136 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2017-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08854 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to racing and wagering