NY S06837 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.271
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.271
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes SUNY college at Westbury to lease lands for the construction and operation of a child care center.
Title
Authorizes SUNY college at Westbury to lease lands for the construction and operation of a child care center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.271 |
2016-08-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.349 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a9413b |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6837B |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1323 |
2016-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6837A |
2016-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09413 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s6837b