NY S06835 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 6835C
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 6835C
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the base benefit amount for computation of pension cost-of-living adjustments.
Title
Increases the base benefit amount for computation of pension cost-of-living adjustments.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Jabari Brisport [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Mike Martucci [R] |
Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6835C |
2022-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6835B |
2022-01-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6835A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |