NY S06835 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits state employees to be excused from work without loss of compensation for up to four hours to donate blood; permits supervisor to require proof of such donation.
Title
Permits state employees to be excused from work without loss of compensation for up to four hours to donate blood; permits supervisor to require proof of such donation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.502 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-11-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A03246 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - committed to governmental employees