NY S06835 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition and licensing fees for dealer-controlled electronic table games.
Title
Relates to the definition and licensing fees for dealer-controlled electronic table games.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.256 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2017-07-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08639 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to racing and wagering