NY S06830 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6830B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6830B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of New York to impose a personal income surcharge on high income residents to fund transit improvements and reduced fares for low income residents.
Title
Authorizes the city of New York to impose a personal income surcharge on high income residents to fund transit improvements and reduced fares for low income residents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6830B |
2018-02-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6830A |
2017-06-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08956 (Same As) 2018-02-27 - print number 8956a