NY S06823 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - PRINT NUMBER 6823A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - PRINT NUMBER 6823A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the benefits of the variable supplements fund to New York city transit police who retired after October 1, 1968; amends the definition of a beneficiary.
Title
Extends the benefits of the variable supplements fund to New York city transit police who retired after October 1, 1968; amends the definition of a beneficiary.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] |
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6823A |
2018-04-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08585 (Same As) 2018-04-23 - print number 8585a