NY S06822 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the expiration of the mortgage recording tax imposed by the city of Yonkers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the expiration of the mortgage recording tax imposed by the city of Yonkers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-30SenateSIGNED CHAP.179
2023-06-29SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-05Assemblyhome rule request
2023-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.543
2023-06-05Assemblysubstituted for a7238
2023-05-23Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-05-23SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.978
2023-05-10SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07238 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - substituted by s6822

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback