NY S06821 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8355B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8355B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Great Valley creek and its tributaries as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates Great Valley creek and its tributaries as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8355B |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1107 |
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6821A |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08355 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.232