NY S06812 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7426
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7426
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a duly appointed personal representative of the estate of a victim of the September eleventh, two thousand one terrorist attacks to file a claim with the September eleventh victim compensation fund without being in violation of any restriction on the powers granted to the personal representative relating to the filing of a claim.
Title
Allows a duly appointed personal representative of the estate of a victim of the September eleventh, two thousand one terrorist attacks to file a claim with the September eleventh victim compensation fund without being in violation of any restriction on the powers granted to the personal representative relating to the filing of a claim.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7426 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1181 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07426 (Same As) 2022-09-09 - signed chap.558